HARBOROUGH WELLAND U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The HWu3a has over 70 groups which enables it to offer a very wide range of activities to its members. These may help increase fitness and mobility (6 different walking groups, cycling, country dancing etc) or more learning or artistic based activities ( choir, art appreciation, archaeology and a large gardening group). There are monthly meetings with a speaker. All groups are led by the members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- HWU3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Saunders | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Heaton | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Davison | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Costall | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Horton | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Reed | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elsome | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.55k | £65.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.19k | £65.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN MARKET HARBOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Bath Street
MARKET HARBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE16 9EL
- Phone:
- 07803204464
- Email:
- secretary@hwu3a.org.uk
- Website:
-
HWu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window