FUSION CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fusion Church conducts services on Sundays, which include worship, prayer, teaching and fellowship. The church members also pray for individual needs and wider needs in the local area and beyond. The church also give financial and other support to people at the discretion of the trustees. The church also gives financial aid to other charitable organisations to meet the needs of the disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Christopher Hole | Chair | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Collins | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN IRWIN MULLEN | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Margaret Mullen | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Carole Hole | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy George Collins | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.85k | £19.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.73k | £18.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN MORECAMBE, LANCASHIRE OR OTHER PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WIDER WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE, THROUGH WORSHIP, PRAYER, TEACHING, PASTORAL CARE AND MISSION WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Battismore Road
MORECAMBE
Lancashire
LA4 4QG
- Phone:
- 07818532827
- Email:
- info@fusionchurch.org.uk
- Website:
-
fusionchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window