Financial history THE SILK HERITAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 519521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £405.40k £405.40k £498.16k £361.03k £554.80k
Total expenditure £345.19k £345.19k £455.50k £470.86k £398.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £86.00k £216.39k £101.17k £86.00k £106.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.37k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.53k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £145.15k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £848
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £365.91k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £382.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.70k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0