THE SHAW SOCIETY

Charity number: 1200279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Performances Talks and Lectures Magazine The Shavian Literary Walks Play reading Workshop

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,411
Total expenditure: £2,261

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 September 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAUREEN CLARK-DARBY Chair 28 February 2014
THE HEATH AND HAMPSTEAD SOCIETY
Received: On time
Mary Bernadette Skehan ACA Trustee 25 October 2024
None on record
Cara Saul Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
John Barber Trustee 22 October 2024
IRISH GEORGIAN SOCIETY LONDON
Received: On time
NEWHAM MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Julia Holocener Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
David Grapes Trustee 16 July 2023
None on record
John Foley Trustee 16 July 2023
AGE UK CITY OF LONDON
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
Ivan Wise Trustee 16 July 2023
ARK - T CENTRE
Received: On time
Ryan Cormack Trustee 16 July 2023
None on record
ESME KATHARINE CHANDLER Trustee 16 July 2023
None on record
Murray Rosenthal Trustee 16 July 2023
None on record
Christine Stevenson Trustee 16 July 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.41k
Total expenditure £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Somali Road
LONDON
NW2 3RL
Phone:
07919446246