AVENGER PERFORMING ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performing arts activities including Dance and Colour Guard for young people in the Preston and District area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 December 1987: Standard registration
- AVENGERS (Working name)
- AVENGER CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANTHONY GUTTERIDGE | Chair |
|
||||||||
VICKI WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
TINA PROCTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KIRSTY LOUISE KENNY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.87k | £6.84k | £451 | £4.16k | £1.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.76k | £7.11k | £1.73k | £3.29k | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED 11 AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE PRESTON AREA IN ALL ASPECTS OF PERFORMING ARTS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PLAYING MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, COLOUR GUARD, DANCE AND DRAMA, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND PROVIDING DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES.
Area of benefit
PRESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 WINDSOR AVENUE
ASHTON-ON-RIBBLE
PRESTON
PR2 1JD
- Phone:
- 01772460468
- Email:
- admin@avengers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window