THE LAPWORTH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Almshouse accommodation. Grants to individuals and local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 November 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN CORNEY | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev PATRICK HOARE GERARD | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
HUGH OWEN ROBERTS | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr RHODERIC EION NICOL | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Susan HUNT | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
JENNIFER ANN BRAGG | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
ELIZABETH MARY BEAVER | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
CLIVE GARFIELD WHEREAT | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Judy McCluskey | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Sarah Jane Thompson | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dorothy Ann Claire Hill | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 10 NOV 2022 AMENDED ON 07 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT: (A). THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY: I. THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMSHOUSES; II THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING; AND II. THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE LIVING IN THE ALMSHOUSES OR OTHER SOCIAL HOUSING PROVIDED BY THE CHARITY; (B). THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR POOR HEALTH AMONGST THOSE IN NEED; (C). THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS; AND (D). THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND ORGANISATIONS BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I). THE PAYMENT TO ST. THOMAS'CHURCH, LOWER NUTHURST, HOCKLEY HEATH WARWICKSHIRE OF SUCH AMOUNT (IF ANY) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME; AND (II). AN ANNUAL PAYMENT TO ST. MARY'S CHURCH, LAPWORTH, WARWICKSHIRE FOR THE REPAIR, RUNNING AND MAINTENANCE, AND IF NECESSARY, REBUILDING OF THE CHURCH OF NOT LESS THAN ONE EIGHTH OF THE CHARITY'S DISTRIBUTABLE INCOME FOR THE CHARITY'S PREVIOUS ACCOUNTING YEAR AFTER THE DESIGNATION (IF ANY) OF FUNDS THAT THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE TO MEET THE OTHER OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY."
Linked charities
- 11 November 1976 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Braids
Rising Lane
Lapworth
SOLIHULL
B94 6JE
- Phone:
- 01564784193
- Email:
- lapworthcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window