NORTH COLCHESTER MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide premises containing a full range of wood working machinery, supervision and training to enable members to work together to make and repair articles in wood. It also arranges visits to places of interest and social activites such as eating out. It also has some recreational equipment and facilites to hold extended refreshment breaks encourageing interaction and social inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,400 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 28 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Newnham | Chair | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Polom | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||
James Waterhouse | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Kean | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Unger | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Thomas | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Williams | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.98k | £11.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.75k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.20k | £2.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF MEN, RESIDENT IN NORTH COLCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREA, BY ASSISTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SOCIAL SPACE IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY TO UNDERTAKE AND SHARE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKDEAN
LANGHAM ROAD
BOXTED
COLCHESTER
CO4 5HU
- Phone:
- 01206273977
- Email:
- newnhams@live.cmxc
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window