PELSALL DISABLED PERSONS ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Money is raised by donations, raffles, sale of goods made by members, membership contributions. Money is used for trips out for members, petrol & repairs for ambulance, drivers fees & insurance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 13 January 1988: Standard registration
- 05 September 2017: Funds received from 505039 THE WILLENHALL FELLOWSHIP FOR THE DISABLED
- 20 September 2022: Funds transferred to 700859 ACORNS CHILDREN'S HOSPICE TRUST
- 20 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1014851 HOSPICE UK
- 20 September 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- PELSALL PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS ORGANISATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.94k | £6.05k | £5.14k | £4.03k | £31.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.23k | £9.36k | £8.36k | £7.82k | £13.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2022 | 321 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 November 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 07 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/12/1987 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS WHO LIVE IN THE PELSALL WARD OF THE ALDRIDGE/BROWNHILLS URBAN DISTRICT COUNCIL, NOW PART OF THE WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
PELSALL WARD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window