THE ELISABETH HENDERSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education, including by (but not limited to) awarding scholarships, maintenance allowances, grants or other support for educational activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAGNUS VON WISTINGHAUSEN | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Paula Marilyn McDonald | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Richards | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard James Bray | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 May 2025 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, GRANTS OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITY; AND 3.2 ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bates Wells Braithwaite
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 07798642175
- Email:
- contact@ehfoundation.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window