Accounts and annual returns THE LINCOLN CHORALE

Charity number: 519736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 September 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 September 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 October 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required