TRANSFORMATION PARTNERSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cultural education programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 July 2022: CIO registration
- HANDSWORTH PAROCHIAL MUSIC DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Laura Shapiro | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Louis Martin Herford | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Gray | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Keith Fraser | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Khadeem Duncan-Banerjee | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Morris | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2022 as amended on 12 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES TO ADVANCE APPRECIATION OF, AND EDUCATION IN, THE ART OF MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING CHORAL SINGING SCHEMES, MUSIC PARTICIPATION PROGRAMMES AND PERFORMANCES TO INCLUDE INFORMATIVE EDUCATIVE TALKS ADDRESSING MUSIC HISTORY, CULTURE, THEORY, PRACTICAL APPLICATION AND OTHER KEY LEARNING AREAS IN BOTH SACRED AND NON-SACRED SETTINGS WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 14
Gill House
140 Holyhead Road
Handsworth Wood
Birmingham
West Mid
- Phone:
- 07535656768
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window