SAMPSON'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1200297
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide accommodation for those in financial need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £191,988
Total expenditure: £220,927

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 2022: CIO registration
  • 17 April 2023: Funds received from 201693 SAMPSON'S ALMSHOUSES
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Harold David Uffindell Chair 29 September 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S FARNHAM
Received: 70 days late
THE MYLNE TRUST
Received: On time
BIRCH'S GIFT
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSE, FARNHAM
Received: On time
FARNHAM CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
GUILDFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Mark Nicholas Berezicki Trustee 09 April 2024
None on record
Jonathan Daniel Allen Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Sarah Jane Leach Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Nigel John Marriott Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2024
Total gross income £191.99k
Total expenditure £220.93k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 28 February 2025 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 28 February 2025 61 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 THE MALTINGS
LIPHOOK
GU30 7DG
Phone:
07851 365298