Accounts and annual returns CLOVERLANDS MODEL CAR MUSEUM

Charity number: 1198716
Charity reporting is up to date (145 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 January 2025 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 March 2025 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window