GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF SHEFFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 March 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andreas Tteralli | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Athanasios Charalampopoulos | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Archbishop Nikitas Lulias | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Vlasios Oktseloglou | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 May 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 May 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
I. “THE ADVANCEMENT OF GREEK ORTHODOX RELIGION (EASTERN CHRISTIANITY) IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON EASTERN CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE RELIGION, AND THROUGH ACTIONS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND OTHER CHARITABLE NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA.” II. “TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE GREEK LANGUAGE, BYZANTINE ECCLESIASTICAL MUSIC, GREEK DANCING AND COOKERY.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 TAPTON HILL ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 5GA
- Phone:
- 07432666028
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window