FRIENDS OF MTSHABEZI HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1202058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support in the relief of sickness and preservation of the health of all the patients of Mtshabezi Hospital in the Gwanda District of Zimbabwe by providing or assisting in the provision of equipment, facilities and services not normally provided by the statutory authorities and which are ancillary to those provided by the doctors.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £653
Total expenditure: £363

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHARON LINGISIWE KHUMALO Chair 22 February 2023
None on record
Nomthandazo Ndebele Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Dumisani NCUBE Trustee 01 January 2025
WEST MIDLANDS BRETHREN IN CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
The Anabaptist Mennonite Network
Received: On time
Mduduzi Mpande Trustee 01 January 2025
Brethren In Christ Church in the UK
Received: On time
Sheron Ndlovu Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
Joleen Wylie Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Eliakim M Sibanda Professor Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Abraham Ndlovu Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Rev Elias Moyo Trustee 22 February 2023
KINGDOM CRICKET INTERNATIONAL
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Mission EduCare Associates
Received: On time
FOREST GATE BRETHREN IN CHRIST CHURCH
Charity reporting is overdue by 856 days
FRIENDS OF THE THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE OF ZIMBABWE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2024
Total gross income £653
Total expenditure £363
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36 GEARY COURT
24 THE CONCOURSE
LONDON
N9 0QT
Phone:
00447940768047