ANASTASIA DAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anastasia Days provides tailored, memorable high quality day out based experiences to help advance the emotional recovery of young people between the age of 6 to 16 who have recently encountered illness, abuse, disability, bereavement or other significant trauma in the North of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
- Bolton
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 20 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Thomas Costello | Chair | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JulieAnn Heath | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Mary Costello | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Edina Muchinyu | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 September 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 September 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TAILORED, MEMORABLE HIGH QUALITY DAY OUT BASED EXPERIENCES TO HELP ADVANCE THE EMOTIONAL RECOVERY OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 6 TO 16 IN ENGLAND AND WALES WHO HAVE RECENTLY ENCOUNTERED ILLNESS, ABUSE, DISABILITY, BEREAVEMENT OR OTHER SIGNIFICANT TRAUMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 VICTORIA ROAD
NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS
WA12 9RX
- Phone:
- 07940130566
- Email:
- contact@anastasia-days.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window