ST MICHAEL'S YORK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The operation of the Spurriergate Centre in York with associated counselling, listening and pastoral services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 February 1988: Standard registration
- 07 June 2019: Funds received from 512656 THE NORTH YORKSHIRE AND DISTRICT CHRISTIAN BROADCA...
- THE SPURRIERGATE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL CRISPIN BROOKES | Trustee | 18 February 2025 | ||||||
KAREN DIXON | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amber Paige Boydell | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.99k | £91.00k | £60.36k | £62.72k | £53.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.30k | £78.00k | £70.68k | £70.97k | £48.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £6.36k | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 April 2022 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS OF 1 APRIL 1991, 13 OCTOBER 1993 AND 21 DECEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF YORK AND ELSEWHERE PARTICULARLY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND RUNNING OF A CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES AND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVEING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
YORK AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MICHAEL'S TRUST
The Spurriergate Centre
St. Michaels Church
Spurriergate
YORK
YO1 9QR
- Phone:
- 01904 629393
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window