HTH TEAMWORK CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HTH Teamwork CIO (Happy to Help Gateshead) provides weekly support including domestic help, prescription collection, shopping and errands to enable vulnerable Gateshead residents to live independently in their own homes in safety and comfort. We also provide a flexible assisted outings service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 02 December 2022: CIO registration
- HAPPY TO HELP GATESHEAD (Working name)
- HAPPY TO HELP (Previous name)
- HTH TEAMWORK CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND BRIAN HOWELL MBE | Chair | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
EILEEN MCMASTER | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
BRIAN JOHN STONEMAN | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Christine Margery Kennedy | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE IN THE BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE COUNTY OF TYNE AND WEAR THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF EMPLOYEES AND VOLUNTEERS TO PROVIDE PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE SERVICES, COMPANIONSHIP/SOCIAL INTERACTION. (II) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL/LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY ROSARY PRESBYTERY
WATSON STREET
GATESHEAD
NE8 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01914785919
- Email:
- liz@teamwork-dt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window