COMMUNITY INTEGRATED CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMMUNITY INTEGRATED CARE WORK ACROSS THE WHOLE OF THE CARE SPECTRUM DELIVERING DIVERSE SUPPORT AND CARE SERVICES ACROSS ENGLAND AND SCOTLAND. THE CHARITY PROVIDES SUPPORTED LIVING FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING OR PHYSICAL DIFFICULTIES AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH CONCERNS .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£169,787,000
Donations and legacies | £2.43m | |
Charitable activities | £166.05m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.10m | |
Other | £206.00k |
Total expenditure:
£166,486,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £166.49m | |
Other | £0 |
£306,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £168,000,000 from 117 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £166.49m | |
Retained for future use | £3.30m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £166.49m | |
Retained for future use | £3.61m |
People

5822 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 6 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- C I C (Working name)
- COMMUNITY INTEGRATED CARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Alexander Roberts | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Shillito | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Mangaru | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Firth Akenhurst | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Catherine Ryan | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Wallace Dobbin | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Claire Tunmore | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jane Wearne | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Donald Rhodes | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA DE RYK | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Daniel Gallagher | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Esther Fenech | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Fraser Lemmon | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.37m | £142.24m | £143.15m | £148.35m | £169.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.45m | £147.37m | £142.04m | £149.49m | £166.49m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £130.93m | £141.31m | £140.40m | £147.51m | £168.00m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.43m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £130.93m | £141.31m | £140.40m | £147.51m | £166.05m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £162.00k | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other | £434.53k | £935.00k | £3.02m | £680.00k | £206.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £132.42m | £141.73m | £142.02m | £149.49m | £166.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £111.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £31.00k | £5.64m | £11.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £37.07m | £27.74m | £16.74m | £16.37m | £17.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.99m | |
|
Other assets | £24.00m | £29.66m | £48.58m | £44.69m | £37.30m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£867.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | -£159.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £22.15m | £23.56m | £29.40m | £26.29m | £23.76m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MAR 1988. NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 6 OCT 2010. OBJECTS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 DECEMBER 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14/5/14 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JAN 2016 as amended on 09 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
The principal Object of the Charity is to promote for the public benefit the relief of those in need because of youth, age, ill-health, or disability throughout the United Kingdom in such a way as the Charity shall from time to time think fit by, but not limited to: (a) providing specially designed or adapted housing, and items, care or other services or facilities intended to ease the needs of such persons and support individuals with care needs to live independently; (b) assisting in the treatment and care of persons suffering from mental or physical illness of any description or in need of rehabilitation as a result of such illness, by the physical provision of facilities for work and recreation; (c) advancing training (including vocational training) and life-long learning by the funding of research and adding to collective knowledge and understanding of specific areas of study and expertise which shall include (but not limited to) autism, dementia or other illness which the trustees of the charity may agree to include from time to time; (d) supporting research into the care and treatment of persons suffering from illness or disability by the provision of lectures, research, for and by the publication of newsletters devoted to the care and treatment in social healthcare; and (e) raising public awareness of the needs and welfare of such persons, their families and carers.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY INTEGRATED CARE
2 OLD MARKET COURT
MINERS WAY
WIDNES
WA8 7SP
- Phone:
- 01514203637
- Email:
- information@c-i-c.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window