WARKTON VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recreational services to the residents of the village of Warkton and people from the surrounding area. To financially support village events and help foster a sense of community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 October 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Maddison | Chair | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Michelle Louise Issitt | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
James O'Connor | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Lamb | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD JOSEPH MCCORMICK | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WARKTON KETTERING NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Village Hall
Pipe Lane
Warkton
NN16 9XL
- Phone:
- 07395459537
- Email:
- Warktonvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window