PARTNERS ACROSS THE MILES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty in Zambia by providing: grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. To advance the education of children at Hope in Christ School, Lusaka, Zambia by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education and for the benefit of any pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 18 April 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERA ANGELA LLOYD | Chair | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
BERYL ANN QUINLAN | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Brian Lloyd | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|||||
CLIFFORD MICHAEL RANDALL | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Margaret Mead | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ZAMBIA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AT HOPE IN CHRIST SCHOOL, LUSAKA, ZAMBIA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PUPILS OR PERSONS SUPPORTED BY HOPE IN CHRIST SCHOOL, BY PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1.AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES ORGRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OFHIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. 2.PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THATEDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ONLEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 NORMANDY WAY
CHEPSTOW
NP16 5NB
- Phone:
- 01291620643
- Email:
- pam03Feb21@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window