MOOR TIME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES IN BRADFORD AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITIES BY PROVIDING SHORT BREAK CARE AND STAFF-SUPPORTED RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £97,940 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 16 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elliott | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
VICTORIA STREET | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Ella Sanderson | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Henney | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Shain Lisa Wells | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Connop | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gail Rushton | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Goodman Picken | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Young | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UP TO 25 WITH DISABILITIES IN BRADFORD AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITIES BY PROVIDING SHORT BREAK CARE AND STAFF-SUPPORTED RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Darton
Clifford Road
ILKLEY
LS29 0AL
- Phone:
- 07938 641700
- Email:
- hello@moortime.org.uk
- Website:
-
moortime.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window