THE KING'S TRUST GROUP COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prince's Trust Group Company plays a vital role in encouraging a common sense of purpose and strategy across The Prince's Trust Group of charities by sharing best practice, raising funds, making charitable grants, demonstrating the Group's shared impact and managing shared risks in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£14,451,000
Donations and legacies | £11.25m | |
Charitable activities | £803.00k | |
Other trading activities | £28.00k | |
Investments | £176.00k | |
Other | £2.19m |
Total expenditure:
£15,784,000
Raising funds | £2.49m | |
Charitable activities | £13.29m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.49m | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.29m |
People

93 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 7 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- New Zealand
- United States
Governance
- 11 October 2022: Standard registration
- PRINCE'S TRUST GROUP COMPANY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane Brittain CBE | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Segun Ilube CBE | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Green | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shabir Randeree CBE | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Williams | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fell | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Bishop | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.78m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.25m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £28.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £803.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £176.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.19m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £129.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £15.53m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.55m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2022 as amended on 05 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THROUGH ALL CHARITABLE MEANS AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPABILITIES AND TO ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED BY ANY MEANS PERMISSIBLE UNDER CHARITY LAW; AND TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8
GLADE PATH
LONDON
SE1 8EG
- Phone:
- 0800842842
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window