Financial history STOCKPORT AND DISTRICT WORKING LADS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520116
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.73k £41.05k £63.35k £110.85k £56.91k
Total expenditure £56.36k £38.25k £54.15k £81.28k £52.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A