LLJF LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,275 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 March 2023: Standard registration
- THE LOVE LOCAL JOBS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary James Peters | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Steven Robert Sawyer | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Maidment | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 JAN 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND WORKING WITH A RANGE OF PRIVATE, PUBLIC AND VOLUNTARY/CHARITY SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND EMPLOYERS AS A MEANS OF: I) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THE SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS II) ADVANCING EDUCATION III) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
Pelham House
25 Pelham Square
BRIGHTON
BN1 4ET
- Phone:
- 01273651100
- Email:
- Foundation@LoveLocalJobs.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window