THE YEOMANRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the efficiency of a Yeomanry Regiment or Yeomanry Regiments in such charitable ways as the trustees may decide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Rupert Charles de Mauley | Chair | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melfort Andrew Campbell OBE FRSE | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier HUGH JOHN ROBERTSON QVRM TD | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Simon John McMenemy VR | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|||||
John Francis Penley OBE TD | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.22k | £5.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF A YEOMANRY REGIMENT OR YEOMANRY REGIMENTS IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) FOSTERING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS AMONG SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF ANY ONE OR MORE YEOMANRY REGIMENTS (B) PRESERVING THE TRADITIONS OF ANY ONE OR MORE YEOMANRY REGIMENTS (II) PROVIDING AND COMMISSIONING AND MAINTAINING A MEMORIAL OR MEMORIALS TO THOSE MEMBERS WHO HAVE DIED IN THE SERVICE OF THEIR COUNTRY, INCLUDING THE YEOMANRY REGIMENT IN WHICH THEY SERVED (III) DEFINITIONS 'YEOMANRY REGIMENT' MEANS ANY REGIMENT WHICH AT ANY TIME SINCE 1901 HAS BEEN A MEMBER OF THE YEOMANRY FORCE, ANY FORMER OR PRESENT YEOMANRY REGIMENT INCLUDING THE FIRST AID NURSING YEOMANRY OR UNIT OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY OR RESERVE ARMY AND ANY SUB-UNIT WHICH REPRESENTS OR REPLACES A FORMER YEOMANRY REGIMENT, AND 'YEOMANRY REGIMENTS' MEANS MORE THAN ONE YEOMANRY REGIMENT. 'MEMBERS' MEANS IN THIS CLAUSE ALL SERVING AND FORMER SERVING MEMBERS OF (INCLUDING PERSONS ATTACHED FOR MORE THAN FOUR MONTHS TO) A YEOMANRY REGIMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canford
Little Faringdon
LECHLADE
GL7 3QJ
- Phone:
- 07901978717
- Email:
- rupert@demauley.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window