PRESTON AFGHAN FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1201983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING MEMBERS OF THE AFGHAN COMMUNITY IN PRESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,428
Total expenditure: £4,049

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Nasir Ahmad Habibi Trustee 01 January 2022
ASSOCIATION OF AFGHAN HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS-UK
Received: On time
Dr Khalilullah Wahdati Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Mohammed Asif ROUDWALL Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr AJMAL SHAKOOR Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.43k
Total expenditure £4.05k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
45 RUSKIN STREET
PRESTON
PR1 4NA
Phone:
07796206022
Website:

No information available