THE IFA/IPA GROUP BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Act as a benevolent fund and make grants to those in financial need who qualify under our consitution. And the advancement of accounting education by bursaries and grants to student in financial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- China
- Estonia
- Ghana
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Ivory Coast
- Jersey
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Malaysia
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Sri Lanka
- United Arab Emirates
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 February 2023: CIO registration
- 09 December 2024: Funds received from 234082 THE INSTITUTE OF FINANCIAL ACCOUNTANTS AND INTERNA...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Keith Clark | Chair | 16 July 2023 |
|
|||||
David Jame Whitaker | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd William Driscoll | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Rabah | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anjana Hirani | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: - (1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF ANY BENEFICIARY (AS DEFINED BELOW); AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF IFA STUDENTS AND IPA STUDENTS, IN THE SUBJECT OF ACCOUNTANCY (AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE STUDYING OR SEEKING TO STUDY IN THE PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATIONS OF THE IFA AND IPA) THE OBJECTS WILL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES. (3) A BENEFICIARY IS ANY:- (I) IFA NON-VOTING MEMBER OR PAST MEMBER OF THE IFA; (II) IPA MEMBER; OR (III) NON-VOTING STUDENTS OF THE IFA OR IPA (IV) THE DEPENDENTS OF ANY OF THE PERSONS DESCRIBED IN 3(I) AND 3(II) AND 3(III) ABOVE. THE IFA REFERS TO THE INSTITUTE OF FINANCIAL ACCOUNTANTS, AN INTERNATIONAL RECOGNISED PROFESSIONAL ACCOUNTANCY MEMBERSHIP BODY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE IPA REFERS TO THE INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS A PROFESSIONAL ACCOUNTANTS MEMBERSHIP BODY IN AUSTRALIA, BOTH OF THESE ENTITIES ARE FULL MEMBERS OF THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF ACCOUNTANTS, THE GLOBAL ACCOUNTING REGULATOR. THE CHARITY IS COMPLETELY INDEPENDENT OF THESE ACCOUNTING BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unitec House
2 ALBERT PLACE
LONDON
N3 1QB
- Phone:
- 07768920188
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window