ETHNIC MINORITIES IN CANTERBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We build community cohesion and celebrate cultural and ethnic diversity. We support ethnic minorities to understand their rights and responsibilities and to develop skills to flourish in society. We promote health and wellbeing through raising awareness and prevention programmes. We support people who experience disadvantage or discrimination and/or find it difficult to access services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 15 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chiedza Helen Madzokere | Chair | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Morounkeji Moses | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Oliver Azubuike Enwonwu | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Mohamed Sakel | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Agyapal Singh Babra | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE. (2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. (3) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN CANTERBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING A FORUM AND LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE ETHNIC COMMUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; (B) INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE ETHNIC COMMUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR IN RESPECT OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 DOVER STREET
CANTERBURY
CT1 3HQ
- Phone:
- 07386904770
- Email:
- emiccanterbury@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window