SUPPORT FOR REFUGEES EAST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Refugees East Midlands (SFREM) is a registered charity supporting refugees and asylum seekers in the East Midlands. The majority of our activity is in the Newark and Sherwood area and we work in partnership with: Newark and Sherwood District Council The Nottingham Refugee Forum Home Start Support Refugees in Southwell Framework, Opportunity and Change
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Hungerford Hillary | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Patrick Geraghty | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Margaret Geraghty | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Irene Hillary | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE. IN THIS CLAUSE, SOCIAL EXCLUSION MEANS THOSE WHO ARE, OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY REASON OF THEIR ASYLUM SEEKER, HUMANITARIAN PROTECTION OR REFUGEE STATUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 CROFT ROAD
EDWALTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG12 4BW
- Phone:
- 07775510000
- Email:
- tony_hillary@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window