THE PILLARS OF ST. MICHAEL`S BETCHWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are for the public benefit,the repair,maintenance,preservation,restoration,and replacement and improvement of the fabric of St.Michael's Church Betchworth and its churchyard,along with the monuments,fittings,fixtures,stained glass,furniture,ornaments and chattels, by making grants from the money collected to the St. Michaels Church Betchworth Parochial Church Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Arthur Rodin | Chair | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
sally norah cronk | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
lesley jane bolton | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Armitage | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN JOHN HIGGINS | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
JOHANNA MARIA HAMILTON | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Patrick Lynch | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Charles William Smith | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENE?T, THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, REPLACEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF ST MICHAEL’S CHURCH BETCHWORTH AND ITS CHURCHYARD, ALONG WITH THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS, AND CHATTELS BY MAKING GRANTS FROM THE MONEY COLLECTED TO THE ST. MICHAEL’S BETCHWORTH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (“THE PCC”). IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: (1) TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLE TO BECOME MEMBERS OF THE PILLARS AND PAY THE MEMBERSHIP FEE THEREOF; (2) TO RAISE MONEY BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS FOR THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, REPLACEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF ST, MICHAEL’S CHURCH AND ITS CHURCHYARD; (3) TO IMPLEMENT NEW IDEAS FOR COMMUNITY FUNDRAISING IN SUPPORT OF THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, REPLACEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF ST. MICHAEL’S CHURCH AND ITS CHURCHYARD; (4) TO MAKE GRANTS FROM THE MONEY COLLECTED TO THE ST. MICHAEL’S BETCHWORTH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (“THE PCC”) FOR THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, REPLACEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF ST MICHAEL’S BETCHWORTH AND ITS CHURCHYARD FOLLOWING SPECIFIC REQUESTS FROM THE PCC TREASURER FOR ASSISTANCE; AND (5) TO COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION AND TO RAISE AWARENESS ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THESE OBJECTS. THE PILLARS WILL NOT RAISE MONEY TO FUND ANY CLERGY COSTS OR CHARITABLE GIVING BY ST. MICHAEL’S CHURCH BETCHWORTH. THE PILLARS SHALL BE INDEPENDENT OF THE PCC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STABLES
SANDY LANE
BETCHWORTH
SURREY
RH3 7AA
- Phone:
- 07770315907
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window