THE BOOTLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide and maintain on a ÔÇÿnot for profitÔÇÖ basis a financially sustainable community centre in the village. The village hall will be provided for use without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, age, disability, nationality, race or political, religious or other opinions. Including use of the hall for meetings, lectures and classes or other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £62,633
Total expenditure: £31,677

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1968: Standard registration
  • 21 February 2023: Funds received from 515494 BOOTLE ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS AND UNITED REFORM...
  • 30 July 2024: Funds received from 1163639 BOOTLE AND DISTRICT SWIMMING CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Jane Fox Chair 19 October 2023
None on record
Paul Jenkinson Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
IAN FOX Trustee 31 August 2010
None on record
GARETH SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.40k £2.80k £7.59k £15.35k £62.63k
Total expenditure £2.81k £1.21k £2.96k £6.96k £31.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 05 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 05 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 August 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 HYCEMOOR WAY
BOOTLE STATION
MILLOM
LA19 5XE
Phone:
01229718536
Website:

No information available