MINISTERIO BENDICIENDO A LAS NACIONES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ministerio Bendiciones a las Naciones is a Latin American church based in London with connections to Latin America and Spain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bolivia
- Colombia
- Ecuador
- Peru
- Spain
- Venezuela
Governance
- 24 October 2022: Standard registration
- MBN (Working name)
- MINISTERIO BENDICIONES A LAS NACIONES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER GRASSHAM | Chair | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Pedro Pablo Arias | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Darby | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucia Darby | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JUL 2022 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL OUTREACH WORK, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 2 MACKONOCHIE HOUSE
BALDWINS GARDENS
LONDON
EC1N 7AQ
- Phone:
- 07985247051
- Email:
- pariasuk@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window