THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN NORTH EAST

Charity number: 1201984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist in bringing the Christian faith to the community and to help those who want to grow in their faith. To work alongside all age groups in nurturing and sustaining a relationship between them and God. To assist and walk alongside those in need, which includes establishing and promoting community projects and providing practical help for the disadvantaged, socially excluded and marginalised.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £123,639
Total expenditure: £104,306

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Andrew Beck Chair 23 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN TOWN CENTRE
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
Eric Grindrod Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Richard James Arthur Thomas Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Nicola Claire Cosens Trustee 31 October 2023
SALFORD DIOCESE SCHOOLS BUILDING PROJECT
Received: On time
Leslie Maurice Williams Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Michael Jordan Knight Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Joanne Elizabeth McClennon Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Vincent McCarthy Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Rev Susan Yvonne Fulford Trustee 18 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN TOWN CENTRE
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
Rev Sandra Jones Trustee 03 November 2020
None on record
Charles Peter Walker Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Helen Hollis Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
David Michael Garrington Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Julie Oldham OBE Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Joan Garrington Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Susan Whittle Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Barbara Lynn Holden Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Janet Dickinson Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Margaret Ruth Bishop Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Rev Dorothy Grace Gosling Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN TOWN CENTRE
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
Rev Samantha Louise Nicholson Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN TOWN CENTRE
Recently registered
Rev Stanley Anthony Higginson Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN TOWN CENTRE
Recently registered
Rev Mark John Wade Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
Rev Neil John Cook Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN SOUTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN TOWN CENTRE
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN CENTRAL
Recently registered
Rev Judith Frances Shoesmith Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIGAN WEST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.64k
Total expenditure £104.31k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants £6.66k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TRANSFORMING WIGAN
WIGAN INVESTMENT CENTRE
WATERSIDE DRIVE
WIGAN
WN3 5BA
Phone:
01942410910
Website:

No information available