CLIMATE ACTION WENDOVER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improve local environment through planting trees and wildflowers. We encourage local residents and children to do the same. We encourage local residents to reduce their carbon footprint via general education and by participating in local projects that will carbon emissions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 13 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL BLACKMORE | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Sarah Hooper | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Taylor | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Horn | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
George James Guest | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Moring | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Frederick Toplis | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justine Sarah Hamer | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Jane Nightingale | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Bernard Blackmore | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Kirsty Eleanor Shanahan | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF WENDOVER AND SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR: 1. BY INCREASING BIODIVERSITY; 2. BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CAUSES AND IMPACT OF CLIMATE CHANGE; 3. PROMOTING WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS GOODS AND FOOD, AND; 4. ENCOURAGING PRACTICAL STEPS TO REDUCE ATMOSPHERIC CARBON DIOXIDE LEVELS AND MITIGATE THE EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Bryants Acre
Wendover
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP22 6JY
- Phone:
- 07505142169
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window