EAST KENT FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of the organisation are to: - 1) advance the education of women and girls for the public benefit 2) promote sustainable development for the public benefit 3) advance health for the public benefit 4) advance citizenship for the public benefit by the promotion of civic responsibility and volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 30 August 2022: CIO registration
- 14 May 2024: Funds received from 219375 KENT - EAST KENT FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES
- EAST KENT FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL ANNE EVANS | Chair | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Silk | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Sharon Jane Goff | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Hazel Eileen Bentley | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Coleman | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Driver | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY SPIERS | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mary Brown | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN EAST KENT AND ELSEWHERE. 3.2 THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL AREAS INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION): I. LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ISSUES OF POLITICAL AND SOCIAL IMPORTANCE; II. MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS; AND III. ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, CRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, SCIENCE, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE; (B) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: I. EDUCATING PEOPLE IN THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND II. PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (C) TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (D) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND VOLUNTEERING. 3.3 IN CLAUSE 3.2 “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT GENERATION WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR NEEDS. 3.4 THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN THEIR COMMUNITIES, OF DEVELOPING THEIR CAPACITY AND SKILLS, AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION STANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST KENT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
CROWN HOUSE
JOHN ROBERTS BUSINESS PARK
PEAN HILL
WHITSTABLE
CT5 3BJ
- Phone:
- 01227464106
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window