Trustees EAST KENT FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO

Charity number: 1200218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROL ANNE EVANS Chair 28 March 2018
None on record
Jennifer Anne Silk Trustee 25 April 2025
CHESTFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Sharon Jane Goff Trustee 21 February 2025
CHESTFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
AGE CONCERN (HERNE BAY)
Received: On time
Hazel Eileen Bentley Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Angela Coleman Trustee 21 April 2023
None on record
Julie Driver Trustee 17 February 2023
None on record
SHEILA MARY SPIERS Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record
Sandra Mary Brown Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record