NUNSFIELD HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VENUE/ ROOM HIRE FOR COMMUNITY GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS BOOKED ON REGULAR BASIS. FUNCTION ROOM VENUE. PROVIDE GOOD FACILITIES OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 17 December 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN BREARLEY | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Hitchcock | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
RONALD FROST | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Brodniewski | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Frith | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
ANGELA Walton | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID HODGKINSON | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN ECKERSLEY | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew James Barker | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|||||||
JANET GRAY | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
HILDA HEAP BEM | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JOAN HODGINSON | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MRS PAM CHENEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAUREEN PICKARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANET BARDSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.05k | £45.66k | £42.56k | £31.04k | £40.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.26k | £42.44k | £32.14k | £32.15k | £42.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.50k | £16.00k | £765 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/1967 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 17/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 28/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2014 as amended on 29 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA CONTAINED IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE BOUNDARIES OF THE PARISH COUNCIL OF ALVASTON, BOULTON, ALLENTON AND SHELTON LOCK AS EXISTING ON THE 1 FEBRUARY 1967 AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Linked charities
- 17 December 1969 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nunsfield House Community Centre
33 Boulton Lane
Alvaston
Derby
DE24 0FD
- Phone:
- 01332571113
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window