INFINITY BOAT CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 April 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Mark Peel | Chair |
|
||||||
Thomas Jarleth Mitchell | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Butler | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sarah Mack | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine O'Sullivan | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Mary Corander | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUL 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, ENCOURAGEMENT AND INSTRUCTION IN THE SPORT OF ROWING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO HELP THEM ENJOY THE HEALTHY LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF ROWING, BROADEN THEIR HORIZONS AND LEARN NEW SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Gloucester Place
London
W1U 6HH
- Phone:
- 07950793749
- Email:
- info@infinityboatclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.