MAREHAY MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote community events. Provide facilities for other registered charities. Encourage young people in participation of the community events. Provide social events for elderly. Dancing school for young people, old time dancing, snooker, pool, darts, bingo, quiz for all ages, disabled access and facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
karen Fowkes Miss | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN WALTERS | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|||||
IAN KIRKUP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.03k | £59.28k | £91.46k | £87.27k | £117.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.10k | £48.57k | £58.53k | £107.90k | £120.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.66k | £52.06k | £3.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2022 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2022 | 339 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 December 2020 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 December 2020 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23RD MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION OF AN INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MAREHAY IN THE PARISH OF RIPLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marehay Miners Welfare
268 Derby Road
Marehay
Ripley
DE5 8JN
- Phone:
- 01773742642
- Email:
- janetlong.home@gmail.com
- Website:
-
marehayminers.welfare
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window