THE N. DRUCKER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees are to hold so much of the income and capital of the fund as the trustees from time to time determine for such charities or for such exclusively charitable purposes as the trustees from time to time at their absolute discretion determine
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 December 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNETTE ELLEN CRAIG MPhil LGSM | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
ROBERT DAVID CRAIG LLM, AKC | Trustee | 20 February 1996 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 FEB 1996
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY SO MUCH OF THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Friern Watch Avenue
LONDON
N12 9NU
- Phone:
- 07860395253
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window