INSTITUTE OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY COMMONLY CALLED THE SISTERS OF LORETO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training of children and adults; work related to Roman Catholic Church; provision of retreats and other pastoral works; outreach work; relief of poverty; overseas mission work; caring for members of the Institute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Philippines
Governance
- 04 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER KATHRYN MARY KEIGHER | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Sister Kathleen Hewitt | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Sister Ewa Irena Bem | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Sister Una Coogan | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bromham | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK AS IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE ENGLISH REGION OF THE INSTITUTE AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE REGIONAL NOMINEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IF AT ANY TIME THE INSTITUTE SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK AS IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH REGION THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loreto Education Centre
Dunham Road
ALTRINCHAM
Cheshire
WA14 4GZ
- Phone:
- 01612270220
- Email:
- gareth@ibvm.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window