THE TEW AND HEYTHROP CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1201180
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Johnston Chair
LAWRENCE HOME NURSING TEAM LIMITED
Received: On time
John Steel Trustee
THE VICTORIA LEAGUE FOR COMMONWEALTH FRIENDSHIP
Received: On time
Dr Alexandra Mahon PhD Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE CLARRY Trustee
None on record
MATTHEW FREDERICK DOBBS Trustee
TONBRIDGE SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE KILROOT FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2024
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 05 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 06 March 2025 33 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tracey Barn Farm
Enstone Road
Great Tew
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 4AB
Phone:
+447770630202
Website:

No information available