SEACOURT HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a community hall for the use of all sections of the local community within the Parish of North Hinksey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 January 2023: CIO registration
- 03 October 2023: Funds received from 1000816 SEACOURT HALL
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Michael Fisher | Chair | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
David John Wyatt | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Bartlam | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saman Jamshidifard | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Potter | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Lorna Berrett | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dowe | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Nicholas Kay | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH HINKSEY IN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEACOURT HALL
3 CHURCH WAY
OXFORD
OX2 9TH
- Phone:
- 07452960100
- Email:
- admin@seacourthall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window