AGAL WELLBEING SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Agal Wellbeing Services CIO supports those who are affected by mental health issues, domestic abuse and other relationship related issues within South Asian Community, in Tamil, Sinhalese, Hindi, Urdu and English. Agal offers up to 8 free counselling sessions and free domestic abuse support services. All our counsellors are registered with BACP. Counselling is available in-person and/or online.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £13,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 March 2023: CIO registration
- AGAL COUNSELLING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maharani Kavitha Sasikumar | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
ALLAN JOSEPH | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATHNA KUMARI SANTRAMOHAN | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICKSON BENJAMIN | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE FROM SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITIES, BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING FOR ANY INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE BEEN SUBJECT TO: PHYSICAL, SEXUAL, FINANCIAL, SPIRITUAL, EMOTIONAL AND/OR MENTAL ABUSE WITHIN AN INTIMATE OR 'FAMILY' RELATIONSHIP ('DOMESTIC VIOLENCE').
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellesley House - 1st Floor
98-102 cranbrook Road
Ilford
IG1 4NH
- Phone:
- 07438212578
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window