HU4 COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HU4 provides the residents of HU4 and Kingston upon Hull with the following activities; Warm space, community library, community cafe, food bank, community space, green space, craft sessions, debt advice, health advice, mum and tots sessions and older peoples sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 18 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Sullivan | Chair | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WAUDBY | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Edna Gollagher | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daren Hale | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pea | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bowmaster | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Haley | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Clair Hughes | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE INHABITANTS OF BOOTHFERRY ESTATE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING A COMMUNITY FRIDGE, FOOD BANK AND A JOB CLUB TO ASSIST THOSE IN NEED TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 SIBELIUS RD
HULL
HU4 7NH
- Phone:
- 07830243199
- Email:
- terrysully1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window