21ST GATESHEAD SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To contribute to the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential as individuals and members of their local and national communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 09 November 1966: Standard registration
- 21ST GATESHEAD BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL COLEMAN | Chair | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Vernazza | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gledhill | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lenier | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Irene Johnson | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GIBBS | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bootle | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHY WESTGATE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE BURTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON NORTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Thompson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Mrs JANE Thompson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.71k | £18.41k | £26.17k | £18.07k | £9.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.17k | £13.75k | £12.14k | £6.79k | £7.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.38k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1966 ON BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
GATESHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hepscott Fields
Hepscott
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE61 6GJ
- Phone:
- 07785187458
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window