THE DYLAN RICH LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dylan Rich Legacy provides funding for charitable projects providing (a) access to sport for young people in Nottinghamshire and (b) wildlife conservation and local employment in Kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 21 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael David RICH | Chair | 09 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Clare Carol LOW | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Louise RICH | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Joyce JONES | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carole Anne FRY | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Malcolm Fry | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher LOW | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Patrick JONES | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NOTTINGHAM, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (C) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE AND NATURE CONSERVANCY IN KENYA, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR LOCAL PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
189 MUSTERS ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 7DQ
- Phone:
- 07533423302
- Email:
- info@dylanrichlegacy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window