Gladstone Terrace Centre for Young People

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
Governance
- 08 January 1964: Standard registration
- B B C HOUSE BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Ender | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Adams | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Jopling | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.56k | £9.35k | £15.01k | £6.83k | £94.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48k | £6.62k | £5.71k | £17.45k | £96.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND ORDER OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SCIENCE OF 6 APRIL 1965 (THE DATE OF ADOPTION OF THE CONSTITUTION IS UNKNOWN) 02 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2017 as amended on 29 Aug 2023 as amended on 27 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO PRESERVE AND PROVIDE FOR THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUALITY, DISABILITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; (2) TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GATESHEAD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gladstone Terrace Centre
11/12 Gladstone Terrace
GATESHEAD
Tyne And Wear
NE8 4DY
- Phone:
- 01914777759
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window