GRACE CHURCH UPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith within (but not limited to) the parish of Duston and Upton in the Diocese of Peterborough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Joseph Deja | Chair | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Owen Tomos Davies | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew John Ward MA, PhD | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Alderman | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Kate Green | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Padman Menon | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Alice Peston | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anne Menon RGN, PhD | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Edward Alexander | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Christopher Kinton | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|||||
John Robert Scully | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2023 as amended on 04 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PARISH OF DUSTON AND UPTON IN THE DIOCESE OF PETERBOROUGH; AND 3.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS, AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CIO FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 BARRING STREET
UPTON
NORTHAMPTON
NN5 4DD
- Phone:
- 07743250432
- Email:
- office@gracechurchupton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window